Oregon Catholic Press v. Ambrosetti
Plaintiff: Oregon Catholic Press
Defendant: Vincent A. Ambrosetti
Case Number: 3:2019cv01397
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 13 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Donald J. Schmid (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: djschmid. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Donald J. Schmid for Vincent A. Ambrosetti. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6062897 issued. Signed on 10/31/2019 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp)
October 30, 2019 Filing 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Donald J. Schmid . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6062897. Filed by Vincent A. Ambrosetti. (Milesnick, Elizabeth)
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance of Elizabeth A. Tedesco Milesnick appearing on behalf of Vincent A. Ambrosetti Filed by on behalf of Vincent A. Ambrosetti. (Milesnick, Elizabeth)
October 14, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Unavailability of Leonard DuBoff Filed by Oregon Catholic Press. (DuBoff, Leonard)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Vincent A. Ambrosetti waiver sent on 9/10/2019. Filed by Oregon Catholic Press. (DuBoff, Leonard)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Oregon Catholic Press. (DuBoff, Leonard)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Vincent A. Ambrosetti. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jn)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/2/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/31/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 1/31/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (jn)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons Filed by Oregon Catholic Press. (DuBoff, Leonard)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons sent to Vincent Ambrosetti on 09/03/19 by Oregon Catholic Press. Waiver of Service is due by 10/3/2019. Filed by Oregon Catholic Press. (DuBoff, Leonard)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint, #1 . Filed by Oregon Catholic Press. (DuBoff, Leonard)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5985239 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included copyrights: PA0000525379--I Will Sing--Pauline Krystal Music & International Liturgy Publications. Filed by Oregon Catholic Press against Vince Ambrosetti. (DuBoff, Leonard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oregon Catholic Press v. Ambrosetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent A. Ambrosetti
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Tedesco Milesnick
Represented By: Donald J. Schmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oregon Catholic Press
Represented By: Leonard D. DuBoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?