Diane McKedy v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Plaintiff: Diane McKedy
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv01432
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time on Rule 26, Rule 16, and Discovery Deadlines #12 . A Rule 16 Telephone Conference is set for 11/20/2019 at 09:30AM before Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Counsel are required to confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. The Court directs the parties to submit a jointly proposed schedule to the courtroom deputy by email no later than three business days before the hearing (keeping in mind that Judge Hernandez expects civil cases to be tried within 18 months of the date of filing). The parties shall call into the Court's conference line (the phone number provided via separate email) five minutes prior to the scheduled conference time. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time on Rule 26, Rule 16, and Discovery Deadlines. Filed by Diane McKedy. (Thayer, Bradley)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order for Administrative Correction of the Record pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a) regarding 10 60-Day Order of Dismissal. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The entry was made in the incorrect case. The following corrections were made to the record: The clerk has corrected the docket text by striking the entry. (jp)
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 STRICKEN PER ECF #11 60-DAY ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been informed by counsel for the parties that this action has been settled, IT IS ORDERED that, pursuant to LR 41-1, this action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs and with leave, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to have this order of dismissal set aside and the action reinstated if the settlement is not consummated. Pending motions, if any, are denied as moot. All pretrial deadlines and any trial date are stricken. By Clerk of Court Mary L. Moran. (jp) Modified on 10/2/2019 to strike (jp).
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed on 9/23/2019 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 Stipulated Proposed Form of Order Submitted Stipulated Protective Order. Filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Barhoum, John)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand . Filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Barhoum, John)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 1/7/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/6/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 2/6/2020. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (joha)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Compliance WITH REQUIREMENT TO GIVE NOTICE OF REMOVAL. Filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Related document(s): Declaration, #3 , Notice of Removal, #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Notice #2 .) (Barhoum, John)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Barhoum, John)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 Declaration of John R. Barhoum IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL. Filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 , Notice #2 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Barhoum, John)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Notice re Notice of Removal, #1 NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTIES OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT Filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Barhoum, John)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 19CV35517 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5991915 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C). (Barhoum, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diane McKedy v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: John R. Barhoum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane McKedy
Represented By: Bradley J. Thayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?