Pfeifle v. Portland Terminal Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Greg Pfeifle
Defendant: Portland Terminal Railroad Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01436
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Scheduling Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. Rule 16 Conference is SET for 11/18/2019 at 01:30 PM in Portland Courtroom 14A before Judge Anna J. Brown. Before the Conference, at a minimum counsel must conduct real -time conferral by telephone to prepare a proposed case-management schedule to be submitted to the Court prior to the Rule 16 Conference. The parties shall submit a written joint status report (to include proposed case management schedule) no later than 11/12/19 that include deadlines to complete discovery, to file dispositive motions, and for trial. Parties shall also determine whether they agree to forgo the disclosures required under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1), and file separately with the Clerk of Court the form required by LR 26-2 no later than 11/12/19. (bb)
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Portland Terminal Railroad Company. (Beyer, Amber)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Portland Terminal Railroad Company. (Wheeler, Nicholas)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #5 . Answer or responsive pleasing now due by 10/8/2019. (bb)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 Declaration of Amber A. Beyer In Support of Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Filed by Portland Terminal Railroad Company. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #5 .) (Beyer, Amber)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Filed by Portland Terminal Railroad Company. (Beyer, Amber)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #3 upon Portland Terminal Railroad Company served on 9/10/2019 Filed by Greg Pfeifle. (Brague, Kevin)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Portland Terminal Railroad Company. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/6/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/3/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 2/3/2020. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (rs)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5992136 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Greg Pfeifle against Portland Terminal Railroad Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Brague, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pfeifle v. Portland Terminal Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portland Terminal Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Pfeifle
Represented By: Paul S. Bovarnick
Represented By: Kevin C. Brague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?