Aftab et al v. Quality Loan Service Corporation Washington et al
Plaintiff: Ruby Aftab and Zafar Haq
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation Washington, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Wells Fargo and Does 1 through 5
Case Number: 3:2019cv01461
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Karin J Immergut
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Karin J. Immergut granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses and Replies to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint #27 filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association and Motion to Dismiss Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 #29 . Plaintiffs' Responses due by 11/21/2019. Defendants' Replies due by 12/12/2019. (jy)
November 7, 2019 Filing 31 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint #27 , Motion to Dismiss Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 #29 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cochran, John)
October 28, 2019 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Deltchev, Delian)
October 25, 2019 Filing 29 Motion to Dismiss Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Quality Loan Service Corporation Washington. (Thomas, John)
October 25, 2019 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Quality Loan Service Corporation Washington. (Thomas, John)
October 24, 2019 Filing 27 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Deltchev, Delian)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 OPINION - Plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order, ECF #5 , is DENIED. Plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction also is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 10/15/19 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. See attached order for details. (jy)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Karin J. Immergut granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #23 . Defendant Wells Fargo Bank's Answer is due by 10/25/2019. (jy)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Karin J. Immergut granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #22 . Defendant Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington's Answer is due by 10/25/2019. (jy)
October 7, 2019 Filing 23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #1 . Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Deltchev, Delian)
October 7, 2019 Filing 22 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaint, #1 . Filed by Quality Loan Service Corporation Washington. (Thomas, John)
September 25, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTES of Proceedings: Hearing held on Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order #5 . The parties agreed to have the Court decide the Preliminary Injunction simultaneously with the Temporary Restraining Order. The Court DENIES both the Preliminary Injunction and the Temporary Restraining Order. Plaintiff to pay reasonable costs associated with the change of the sale date. John A. Cohran present as counsel for plaintiff(s). John M. Thomas and Delian P. Deltchev present as counsel for defendant(s).(Court Reporter Jill Jessup.)Judge Karin J. Immergut presiding. (jy)
September 25, 2019 Filing 20 Reply to Wells Fargo Response to Motion for TRO to Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #5 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Cochran, John)
September 25, 2019 Filing 19 Affidavit of Ruby Aftab in Support of Motion for TRO. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #5 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Cochran, John)
September 25, 2019 Filing 18 Notice for Request for Judicial Notice re Response in Opposition to Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #17 Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #5 .) (Deltchev, Delian) Modified on 9/26/2019 to correct document link (ecp).
September 25, 2019 Filing 17 Response in Opposition to Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #5 . Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Deltchev, Delian)
September 24, 2019 Filing 16 Affidavit in Support of Motion for TRO. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #5 .) (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Cochran, John)
September 24, 2019 Filing 15 Affidavit show terms of settlement agreement. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Scheduling, 12 .) (Cochran, John)
September 24, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance of Ann T. Marshall appearing on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association Filed by on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Marshall, Ann)
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance of Delian P. Deltchev appearing on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association Filed by on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Deltchev, Delian)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order by Judge Karin J. Immergut. This Court orders Plaintiff to provide a copy of the terms of the settlement agreement reached in Case # 3:18-cv-00159-MO. Plaintiff is ordered to enter the documentation of the agreement under seal before the hearing scheduled on 9/25/2019 at 4:00 p.m. (jy)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTES of Proceedings: Hearing held on Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order #5 . Counsel for Plaintiff and Quality Loan Serv. Corp. of Washington were present. Counsel for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank was not present. In order to allow Wells Fargo Bank sufficient time to appear, this Court does not rely on the merits of the Temporary Restraining Order but nevertheless orders the sale be stayed and postponed until 10/1/2019. Plaintiff to bear reasonable costs of delaying the sale. The Court continues the hearing for further argument and orders Wells Fargo to appear on 9/25/2019 at 4:00 p.m. before Judge Karin J. Immergut in courtroom 13A. John A. Cohran present as counsel for plaintiff(s). John M. Thomas present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Jill Jessup. Judge Karin J. Immergut presiding. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #5 .) (jy)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 Response to Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #5 . Filed by Quality Loan Service Corporation Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Motion for Relief, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order Granting Relief, #3 Exhibit 3 - Recorded Notice of Default) (Thomas, John)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed as to Wells Fargo Bank, National Association served on 9/20/2019, answer due on 10/11/2019. (filed as Certificate of Service by All Plaintiffs of Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #5 Minutes for Next Hearing (Attachments: #1 Attachment cert of service) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cochran, John) Modified on 9/24/2019 to correct event and docket text (ecp).
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTES of Proceedings: Hearing held on Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order #5 . The Court continues the hearing for further argument on 9/23/2019 at 4:00 p.m. before Judge Karin J. Immergut in courtroom 13A. Plaintiff must provide proof of service re Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order #5 on Defendant Wells Fargo or otherwise meet the requirements for an Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order. John A. Cohran present as counsel for plaintiff(s). John M. Thomas present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Jill Jessup. Judge Karin J. Immergut presiding. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #5 .) (jy)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance of John M. Thomas appearing on behalf of Quality Loan Service Corporation Washington Filed by on behalf of Quality Loan Service Corporation Washington. (Thomas, John)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Scheduling Order by Judge Karin J. Immergut. The Court schedules a hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order #5 for 9/20/2019 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Karin J. Immergut in courtroom 13A. (jy)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Attachment) (Cochran, John)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman to Judge Karin J. Immergut. (eo)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Quality Loan Service Corporation Washington, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/9/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/10/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 2/10/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (ecp)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5996430 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Ruby Aftab, Zafar Haq against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cvr sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. A, #3 Exhibit Ex. B, #4 Proposed Summons Summons for both Defendants). (Cochran, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aftab et al v. Quality Loan Service Corporation Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation Washington
Represented By: John M. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Ann T. Marshall
Represented By: Delian P. Deltchev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Aftab
Represented By: John A. Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zafar Haq
Represented By: John A. Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?