Progressive Universal Insurance Company v. The Department of The United States Army
Plaintiff: Progressive Universal Insurance Company
Defendant: US Army
Case Number: 3:2019cv01494
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order of General Dismissal. Signed on 11/12/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Progressive Universal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Reinert, Christine)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #1 Complaint. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: Correct typographical error in name of defendant. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment.The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to The Department of The United States Army. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/15/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/14/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 2/14/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (sb)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6003039 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Progressive Universal Insurance Company against US Army (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Reinert, Christine) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/17/2019) (cw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Progressive Universal Insurance Company v. The Department of The United States Army
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Army
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Universal Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine L. Reinert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?