Battery Conservation Innovations, LLC v. Leupold & Stevens, Inc.
Plaintiff: Battery Conservation Innovations, LLC
Defendant: Leupold & Stevens, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01513
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 Final Patent Report. (pvh)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Battery Conservation Innovations, LLC. (Madden, David)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Leupold & Stevens, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 Patent Report: This report is submitted pursuant to 35 U.S.C. section 290, which requires the clerks of the courts of the United States, within one month after the filing of an action under this title shall give notice thereof in writing to the Commissioner, setting forth so far as known the names and addresses of the parties, name of the inventor, and the designating number of the patent upon which the action has been brought. If any other patent is subsequently included in the action he shall give like notice thereof. Within one month after the decision is rendered or a judgment issued the clerk of the court shall give notice thereof to the Director. The Director shall, on receipt of such notices, enter the same in the file of such patent. (joha)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/17/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/18/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (joha)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 Report AO-120 on Filing Action Regarding a Patent. Filed by Battery Conservation Innovations, LLC. (Madden, David)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint, #1 . Filed by Battery Conservation Innovations, LLC. (Madden, David)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons Filed by Battery Conservation Innovations, LLC. (Madden, David)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Battery Conservation Innovations, LLC. (Madden, David)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6006381 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included patents/trademarks: 9239158--1/19/2016--Leigh M. ROTHSCHILD. Filed by Battery Conservation Innovations, LLC against Leupold & Stevens, Inc.. (Madden, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Battery Conservation Innovations, LLC v. Leupold & Stevens, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Battery Conservation Innovations, LLC
Represented By: David H. Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leupold & Stevens, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?