Ganete Solutions, Inc. v Software Technology Group, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Ganete Solutions, Inc. d/b/a ArmorerLink and Ganete Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1 to 25 and Software Technology Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01557
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTES OF TELEPHONE RULE 16 CONFERENCE: ORDER - Setting a case schedule as follows: (1) initial disclosures are due by 12/3/2019; (2) amend pleadings and add parties by 4/30/2020; (3) fact discovery to be completed by 6/30/2020; (4) dispositive motions are due by 8/31/2020; (5) confer as to ADR by 8/31/2020; (6) expert discovery to be completed pursuant to FRCP Rule 26; (7) a joint ADR report is due by 9/30/2020; and a 4-day Jury Trial is scheduled for 12/7/2020 at 9:00AM in Portland, Courtroom 15B, before Judge Michael H. Simon. Trial management order to follow. Order - No party may file a contested discovery motion or motion for summary judgment without prior leave of Court. If, after conferring with opposing counsel, a party seeks to bring a discovery dispute or a potential motion for summary judgment to the Court's attention, the parties shall inform the Courtroom Deputy. In most situations, the Court will then request a brief email description of the nature of the dispute and response from each party and will promptly convene a telephone conference with counsel. Gina A. Bibby and Clifford S. Davidson present as counsel for Plaintiff, David S. Aman present as counsel for Defendants. Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. (mja)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael H. Simon. ORDER - At the parties' request, the Court is setting a Telephone Rule 16 Conference for 11/22/2019 at 10:00AM. The Court will provide the parties with a call-in number by separate sealed entry. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
November 8, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Software Technology Group, Inc.. (Aman, David)
November 8, 2019 Filing 15 Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Software Technology Group, Inc.. (Aman, David)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - Defendant Software Technology Group, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ECF #13 ) is GRANTED. Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 11/8/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
November 4, 2019 Filing 13 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #1 . Filed by Software Technology Group, Inc.. (Aman, David)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - Defendant Software Technology Group, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ECF #11 ) is GRANTED. Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 11/4/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
October 18, 2019 Filing 11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #1 . Filed by Software Technology Group, Inc.. (Aman, David)
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed as to Software Technology Group, Inc. served on 9/30/2019, answer due on 10/21/2019. (Davidson, Clifford)
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 Corrected Exhibits (Corrected Exhibit 1 to Complaint) re Complaint, #1 . Filed by Ganete Solutions, Inc.. (Davidson, Clifford)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Gina A. Bibby (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: gabibby. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gina A. Bibby for Ganete Solutions, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6022219 issued. Signed on 10/1/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gina A. Bibby . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6022219. Filed by Ganete Solutions, Inc.. (Davidson, Clifford) Modified on 10/1/2019 to correct attorney name (jn).
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Ganete Solutions, Inc.. (Davidson, Clifford)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Software Technology Group, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jn)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons Filed by Ganete Solutions, Inc.. (Davidson, Clifford)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/28/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/27/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 2/27/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (jn)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6019436 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included patents/trademarks: 5,495,911--6/19/2018--Ganete Solutions Inc., 5,495,913--6/19/2018--Ganete Solutions Inc.. Filed by Ganete Solutions, Inc. d/b/a ArmorerLink against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 through 6, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Davidson, Clifford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ganete Solutions, Inc. v Software Technology Group, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Software Technology Group, Inc.
Represented By: David S. Aman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ganete Solutions, Inc. d/b/a ArmorerLink
Represented By: Clifford S. Davidson
Represented By: Lea K. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ganete Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Clifford S. Davidson
Represented By: Lea K. Schneider
Represented By: Gina A. Bibby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?