Sadowski v. Alpha Media LLC
Plaintiff: Christopher Sadowski
Defendant: Alpha Media LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01646
Filed: October 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 13 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Attorney Richard P. Liebowitz regarding Orders 10 & #12 . (gm)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: As this court has denied Attorney Richard Liebowitz's Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice #11 , it is Ordered that Plaintiff Christopher Sadowski shall advise the court by no later than 12/23/2019 as to his efforts in obtaining new counsel or otherwise advise if he intends to proceed pro se with his case. Plaintiff shall also notify the court on or before 12/23/2019 as to his current mailing address for notification purposes. Signed 11/21/19 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (gm)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Denying Application for Special Admission for attorney Richard Libowitz. Pro Hac Vice Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6089971 issued. Signed on 11/21/2019 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Mailed to counsel Richard Liebowitz) (ecp)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting in Part Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time #6 . Answer deadline reset to 12/23/2019 for Defendant Alpha Media LLC. All other case management deadlines will remain as originally set subject to further consideration at a later date. (gm)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard Liebowitz . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6089971 #8 . Filed by Alpha Media LLC. (Marmaduke, Susan)
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard Liebowitz . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6089971. Filed by Christopher Sadowski. (Liebowitz, Richard)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Defendant Alpha Media LLC. Filed by Alpha Media LLC. (Marmaduke, Susan)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint and Extension of Deadlines in Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order Complaint, #1 . Filed by Alpha Media LLC. (Marmaduke, Susan)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Attorney Richard P. Liebowitz regarding Order 4 . (gm)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: All matters stayed in this case for fourteen (14) days, pending Mr. Liebowitz's pro hoc vice application with accompanying fee and name of local counsel. See Local Rule 83-3. Application to be filed by 11/14/2019. If an Application is not filed, the case may be dismissed unless plaintiff informs the Court of plaintiff's intention to proceed without counsel. (gm)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Alpha Media LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/13/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/16/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 3/16/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (rs)
October 14, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6038651 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Christopher Sadowski against Alpha Media LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Copyright Form). (Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sadowski v. Alpha Media LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Sadowski
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha Media LLC
Represented By: Susan D. Marmaduke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?