Konopka v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Plaintiff: Lindsey M. Konopka
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America and CIGNA Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv01737
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 15 Stipulated Notice of Dismissal of Party as to Cigna Group Insurance and Cigna Corporation Filed by CIGNA Corporation, Life Insurance Company of North America. (Huggler, Hans)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of D. Michael Reilly for CIGNA Corporation and Life Insurance Company of North America. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6101083 issued. Signed on 12/2/2019 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp)
November 27, 2019 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed as to Life Insurance Company of North America served on 11/18/2019, answer due on 12/9/2019. (jn)
November 27, 2019 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed as to CIGNA Corporation served on 11/18/2019, answer due on 12/9/2019. (jn)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney D. Michael Reilly . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6101083. Filed by CIGNA Corporation, Life Insurance Company of North America. (Huggler, Hans)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Acosta - GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #9 . Answer is due by 1/8/2020. (pjg)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #1 . Filed by Life Insurance Company of North America, CIGNA Corporation. (Huggler, Hans)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to CIGNA Corporation, Life Insurance Company of North America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jn)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons Filed by Lindsey M. Konopka. (Sell, Scott)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons Filed by Lindsey M. Konopka. (Sell, Scott)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/2/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/30/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 3/30/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (jn)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 . Signed on 10/31/19 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (peg)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (jn)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP . Filed by Lindsey M. Konopka. (Sell, Scott)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. (In forma pauperis status selected) Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Lindsey M. Konopka against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Sell, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Konopka v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: D. Michael Reilly
Represented By: Hans N. Huggler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA Corporation
Represented By: D. Michael Reilly
Represented By: Hans N. Huggler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey M. Konopka
Represented By: Scott A. Sell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?