H. v. Reta Trust Group Medical Plan
Plaintiff: Laura Heinze and Laura H.
Defendant: Reta Trust Group Medical Plan
Case Number: 3:2019cv01741
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court Grants Defendants Unopposed Motion [#11] for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Defendants answer or responsive pleading is now due no later than 2/3/20. (bb)
November 27, 2019 Filing 12 Declaration of Nicole M. Swift . Filed by Reta Trust Group Medical Plan. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #11 .) (Swift, Nicole)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #1 . Filed by Reta Trust Group Medical Plan. (Swift, Nicole)
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #3 upon Reta Trust Group Medical Plan served on 11/7/2019 Filed by Laura H.. (Glor, Megan)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Lisa S. Kantor (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: lskantor. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lisa S. Kantor for Laura H.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6072730 issued. Signed on 11/7/2019 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp) (Main Document 8 replaced on 11/12/2019) (eo).
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Elizabeth K. Green (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: ekgreen. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth K. Green for Laura H.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6072705 issued. Signed on 11/7/2019 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lisa S. Kantor . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6072730. Filed by Laura H.. (Glor, Megan)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Elizabeth K. Green . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6072705. Filed by Laura H.. (Glor, Megan)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Reta Trust Group Medical Plan. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/28/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/30/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 3/30/2020. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6063400 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Laura Heinze against Reta Trust Group Medical Plan (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Glor, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H. v. Reta Trust Group Medical Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reta Trust Group Medical Plan
Represented By: Nicole M. Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Heinze
Represented By: John C. Shaw
Represented By: Megan E. Glor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura H.
Represented By: John C. Shaw
Represented By: Megan E. Glor
Represented By: Elizabeth K. Green
Represented By: Lisa S. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?