Graves II v. Oregonian
Plaintiff: Cedric H.E. Graves II
Defendant: Oregonian
Case Number: 3:2019cv01755
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Referring Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 11/4/19.) (eo)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/2/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/30/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 3/30/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 11/01/2019.) (rs)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 . Signed on 11/1/19 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 11/1/19.) (peg)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Cedric H.E. Graves II. (rs)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Cedric H.E. Graves II against Oregonian (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (rs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graves II v. Oregonian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregonian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric H.E. Graves II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?