Carney v. Michael Terrace Apartments, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Staci Lyn Carney
Defendant: Mark Passanante, Michael Terrace Apartments, LLC, Mark A. Peterson and Steven Todd
Case Number: 3:2019cv01782
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Karin J Immergut
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order by Judge Karin J. Immergut. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a Notice of Change of Address by no later than February 3, 2020. Plaintiff is advised that failure to file a change of address will result in the dismissal of this proceeding for lack of prosecution. See order for further details.(Mailed to Pro Se party on 12/20/19.) (jy)
December 9, 2019 Filing 10 Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Order of Dismissal #6 sent to Staci Lyn Carney returned as undeliverable. (joha)
December 4, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Notice of Case Assignment #5 sent to Staci Lyn Carney returned as undeliverable. (joha)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order by Judge Karin J. Immergut. Due to a clerical error, plaintiff's street address on the Court docket is incorrect. The Clerk of the Court is directed to correct plaintiff's street address from 422 SE 58th Ave. to 4222 SE 58th Ave. Additionally, the Clerk of the Court is directed to resend the Court's Notice of Case Assignment #5 and Order of Dismissal #6 to plaintiff at the correct address. The deadline for plaintiff to file an amended complaint as set forth in the Court's Order of Dismissal is extended to 12/17/2019. (jy)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Notice of Case Assignment #5 sent to Staci Lyn Camey returned as undeliverable. (joha)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order of Dismissal. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED. The claims against Judges Peterson and Todd are dismissed with prejudice; all other claims are dismissed without prejudice. Within 14 days from the date of this order, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint as to the claims against Defendants Passanante and Michael Terrace Apartments, LLC. Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order, ECF #3 , is denied as moot. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 11/18/19 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. See attached order for further details.(Mailed to Pro Se party on 11/19/19.) (jy)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Karin J. Immergut. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 11/5/19.) (sb)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 Complaint and Request for Injunction. Filed by Staci Lyn Carney. (sb)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Filed by Staci Lyn Carney. (sb)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Staci Lyn Carney against Michael Terrace Apartments, LLC, Mark Passanante, Mark A. Peterson, Steven Todd (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (sb)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Staci Lyn Carney. (sb) Modified on 11/21/2019 (jy).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carney v. Michael Terrace Apartments, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Staci Lyn Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Passanante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Terrace Apartments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?