Ruffner v. Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington, et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Ruffner
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation Washington, JP Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp, Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington and Does 1 through 5
Case Number: 3:2019cv01824
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 25 MINUTES of Proceedings: Hearing Held regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #16 . The Court DENIED Plaintiff's motion finding that the Winters factors were not met. Formal Opinion & Order to follow. The Temporary Restraining Order issued 11/19/2019 is dissolved. The Court DENIED Plaintiff's request to further brief the issue. John A. Cochran present as counsel for plaintiff(s). John M. Thomas present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Nancy Walker. Judge Marco A. Hernandez presiding. (jp)
December 24, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by JP Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp. (Thomas, John)
December 20, 2019 Filing 23 Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by JP Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp, Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington. (Thomas, John)
December 16, 2019 Filing 22 Declaration of Heath Carpenter . Filed by JP Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp. (Related document(s): Response to Motion #21 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Note, #2 Exhibit Business record, #3 Exhibit Deed of Trust, #4 Exhibit Assignment, #5 Exhibit Substitution of Trustee, #6 Exhibit Assignment, #7 Exhibit Assignment, #8 Exhibit Assignment, #9 Exhibit Substitution of Trustee, #10 Exhibit Notice of Default, #11 Exhibit Notice of Sale) (Thomas, John)
December 16, 2019 Filing 21 Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction #16 . Filed by JP Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp. (Thomas, John)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Scheduling Order by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. A hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #16 is set for 1/7/2020 at 09:00AM in Portland Courtroom 15A before Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Defendants' motion for extension of time #18 is GRANTED IN PART. The December 17, 2019, preliminary injunction hearing is CANCELED. Defendants must file an answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by December 20, 2019. Defendants' response to Plaintiffs motion for a preliminary injunction is due on or before December 16, 2019. Plaintiff's reply, if any, is due December 20, 2019. The parties are ordered to contact the Courtroom Deputy to reset the preliminary injunction hearing between January 3, 2020, and January 7, 2020. No further extensions of time concerning the preliminary injunction hearing or briefing will be granted. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
December 3, 2019 Filing 18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer , Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion for Preliminary Injunction #16 . Filed by JP Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp, Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington. (Thomas, John)
December 3, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance of John M. Thomas appearing on behalf of JP Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp Filed by on behalf of JP Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp. (Thomas, John)
December 2, 2019 Filing 16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 01 to Motion - Affidavit of JAC, #3 Exhibit Ex. A to Affidavit of JAC, #4 Exhibit Ex. B to Affidavit of JAC) (Cochran, John)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Scheduling Order: Due to a scheduling conflict, the preliminary injunction hearing set for December 6, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. is CANCELED and RESET for December 17, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 15A before Judge Marco A. Hernandez. The November 19, 2019, temporary restraining order 14 will remain in effect until the conclusion of the preliminary injunction hearing. Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction is due on December 2, 2019. Defendants' response to the motion is due on December 5, 2019. Plaintiff's reply, if any, is due on December 9, 2019. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (pvh)
November 19, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTES of Proceedings: Hearing held regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #2 . The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion. Defendants, their officers, agents, servants, employees, and attorneys are RESTRAINED and ENJOINED from selling, transferring, conveying, possessing, and disposing of the property described as 1042 Lakeridge #1, Lot 004, Block 06, located at 16811 Lakeridge Drive, Lake Oswego, Oregon, in Clackamas County and from ejecting Plaintiff from the property. A preliminary injunction hearing is set for December 6, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. This restraining order will remain in effect until the conclusion of the preliminary injunction hearing. Plaintiff is not required to post a bond or other security. Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction is due on November 27, 2019. Defendants response to the motion is due on December 3, 2019. Plaintiffs reply, if any, is due on December 4, 2019. John A. Cochran present as counsel for plaintiff(s). John M. Thomas present for Defendant Quality Loan Services. Court Reporter: Nancy Walker. Judge Marco A. Hernandez presiding. (jp)
November 18, 2019 Filing 13 Affidavit of Service upon JP Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp served on 11/18/2019 Minutes for Next Hearing Filed by Brenda Ruffner. (Cochran, John)
November 18, 2019 Filing 12 Affidavit of Service of Affidavit of Service #7 Filed by Brenda Ruffner. (Cochran, John)
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington. (Thomas, John)
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance of John M. Thomas appearing on behalf of Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington Filed by on behalf of Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington. (Thomas, John)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Scheduling Order by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. A hearing on Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #2 is set for 11/19/2019 at 10:00AM in Portland Courtroom 15A before Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Hearing TRO 11.19.19 at 10 am Filed by Brenda Ruffner. (Cochran, John)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 Proof of Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #4 upon JP Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp served on 11/15/2019 Filed by Brenda Ruffner. (Cochran, John)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #4 upon Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington served on 11/14/2019 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cochran, John)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit in Support of Motion for TRO. Filed by Brenda Ruffner. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #2 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit UCC Demand Ltr, #2 Exhibit Response, #3 Exhibit Reply letter, #4 Exhibit Insurance issue, #5 Exhibit Proof of service) (Cochran, John)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to JP Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp, Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/12/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/13/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 4/13/2020. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (sb)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Brenda Ruffner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit) (Cochran, John)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6080929 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Brenda Ruffner against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cvr sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Summons QLSC, #5 Proposed Summons JP Morgan Mortgage). (Cochran, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruffner v. Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp
Represented By: John M. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington
Represented By: John M. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Ruffner
Represented By: John A. Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?