Jiang v. American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Plaintiff: Xin Jiang
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01862
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Karin J Immergut
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Scheduling Order by Judge Karin J. Immergut. Telephonic Rule 16 Conference is set for 1/21/2020 at 3:00PM in Portland by telephone before Judge Karin J. Immergut. Before the Conference, at a minimum counsel must conduct real-time conferral by telephone to prepare a proposed case-management schedule to be submitted to the Court prior to the Rule 16 Conference. The parties shall submit a written joint status report (to include proposed case management schedule) no later than 1/15/2020 that include deadlines to complete discovery, to file dispositive motions, and for trial. Parties shall also determine whether they agree to forgo the disclosures required under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1), and file separately with the Clerk of Court the form required by LR 26-2 no later than 1/15/2020. (jy)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by Xin Jiang. (Thede, Nicholas)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 Joint Status Report , Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan . Filed by Xin Jiang. (Thede, Nicholas)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand . Filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Ryan, David)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 3/18/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/17/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 4/17/2020. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (joha)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Ryan, David)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 19cv45851 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6088543 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Ryan, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jiang v. American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Represented By: David J. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xin Jiang
Represented By: Nicholas A. Thede
Represented By: Kyle A. Sturm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?