C6 Capital Funding, LLC v. Scribner, et al
Plaintiff: C6 Capital Funding, LLC
Defendant: Kelvin B. Scribner and Lynette J. Scribner
Case Number: 3:2019cv01874
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. See order for full text. Signed on 12/10/19 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: STRIKING the Preliminary Injunction set for 12/12/2019 at 02:30PM-3:30PM in Portland Courtroom 16 before Judge Michael W. Mosman, per the parties Proposed Form of Order or Judgment #16 . Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
December 6, 2019 Filing 16 Stipulated Proposed Form of Order Submitted Stipulation and Preliminary Injunction Order. Filed by C6 Capital Funding, LLC. (Free, Brian)
December 5, 2019 Filing 15 Declaration of Kelvin Scribner. Filed by All Defendants. (DuBoff, Leonard) Modified on 12/9/2019 to reference Response #13 (jn).
December 5, 2019 Filing 14 Declaration of Shelly Crocker . Filed by All Defendants. (DuBoff, Leonard)
December 5, 2019 Filing 13 Response to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #2 . Filed by Kelvin B. Scribner, Lynette J. Scribner. (DuBoff, Leonard)
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by All Defendants. Filed by C6 Capital Funding, LLC. (Free, Brian)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by C6 Capital Funding, LLC. (Free, Brian)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman regarding Motion for Preliminary Injunction #2 . Response is due by 12/5/2019. Reply is due by 12/10/2019. Preliminary Injunction is set for 12/12/2019 at 02:30PM-3:30PM in Portland Courtroom 16 before Judge Michael W. Mosman. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Stipulation and Temporary Restraining Order. Signed on 11/21/2019 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman. Temporary Restraining Order Hearing set for 11/21/2019 at 03:00PM - 04:00PM is canceled. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman. Temporary Restraining Order Hearing set for 11/21/2019 at 03:00PM - 04:00PM will be in courtroom 16 before Judge Michael W. Mosman. Counsel appearing by phone should call the conference line. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Kelvin B. Scribner, Lynette J. Scribner. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/19/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/20/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 4/20/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (sb)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman. Temporary Restraining Order Hearing set for 11/21/2019 at 03:00PM - 04:00PM in Portland Courtroom 14A before Judge Michael W. Mosman, regarding Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #2 . Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 Declaration of Brian Stulman . Filed by C6 Capital Funding, LLC. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #2 .) (Free, Brian)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by C6 Capital Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Free, Brian)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6090916 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by C6 Capital Funding, LLC against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Free, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C6 Capital Funding, LLC v. Scribner, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelvin B. Scribner
Represented By: Leonard D. DuBoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynette J. Scribner
Represented By: Leonard D. DuBoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C6 Capital Funding, LLC
Represented By: Brian C. Free
Represented By: Amit D. Ranade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?