Rojer v. Jurj, et al
Plaintiff: Omar Rojer
Defendant: Octavian Jurj, Brittany Jurj, Tilt 3 LLC, Tilt 1 LLC, H3ritage, Inc. and Tilt 2 LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01989
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Karin J Immergut
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance of Brian J. Kernan appearing on behalf of Brittany Jurj, Octavian Jurj Filed by on behalf of Brittany Jurj, Octavian Jurj. (Kernan, Brian)
January 17, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Filed by Brittany Jurj, Octavian Jurj. (Stokes, Sean)
January 13, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta to Judge Karin J. Immergut. (eo)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Acosta - GRANTING Unopposed Motion to Consolidate #14 . The Clerk is directed to consolidate case 3:19-cv-01989-AC Rojer v. Jurj, et al, with case 3:19-cv-1946-IM; Zarrabi v. Jurj, et al. (pjg)
December 20, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed Motion to Consolidate . Filed by H3ritage, Inc., Tilt 1 LLC, Tilt 2 LLC, Tilt 3 LLC. (Driscoll, Sean)
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement for H3ritage, Inc.. Filed by H3ritage, Inc., Tilt 1 LLC, Tilt 2 LLC, Tilt 3 LLC. (Driscoll, Sean)
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by H3ritage, Inc., Tilt 1 LLC, Tilt 2 LLC, Tilt 3 LLC. (Driscoll, Sean)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by H3ritage, Inc., Tilt 1 LLC, Tilt 2 LLC, Tilt 3 LLC. (Driscoll, Sean)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by H3ritage, Inc., Tilt 1 LLC, Tilt 2 LLC, Tilt 3 LLC. (Driscoll, Sean)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and Affirmative Defenses. Filed by H3ritage, Inc., Tilt 1 LLC, Tilt 3 LLC, Tilt 2 LLC. (Driscoll, Sean)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Acosta Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #7 . Answer is due by 12/20/2019. (pjg)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Filed by H3ritage, Inc., Tilt 1 LLC, Tilt 3 LLC, Tilt 2 LLC. (Driscoll, Sean)
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) . Filed by Octavian Jurj, Brittany Jurj. (Hawk, Christopher)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order for Administrative Correction of the Record pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a) regarding #4 Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: Due to the parties being incorrectly entered on the docket the short case title and caption of the Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order were incorrect. The following corrections were made to the record: The case title has been corrected to: Rojer v. Jurj, et al. A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment.The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (sss)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/9/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/11/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 5/11/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (sss) (Main Document 4 replaced on 12/11/2019) (sss).
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding (#1 ) Notice of Removal. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The incorrect event was used. The following corrections were made to the record: The incorrect event was selected at filing. The initial Notice event has been deleted and the Notice of Removal event has been docketed by the Clerk's Office. Additionally, the entry has been renumbered to #1, and docket text has been corrected to add payment information. The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (eo)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 19CV43275 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6112788. Jury Trial Request: Yes. Filed by H3ritage, Inc., Tilt 1 LLC, Tilt 3 LLC, Tilt 2 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (eo) Redocketed by the Clerk's Office and modified docket number from 3 to 1 on 12/9/2019 (eo).
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 Declaration of Sean M. Driscoll ISO Notice of Removal. Filed by H3ritage, Inc., Tilt 1 LLC, Tilt 2 LLC, Tilt 3 LLC. (Related document(s): Notice or Removal #1 .) (Driscoll, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rojer v. Jurj, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Octavian Jurj
Represented By: Christopher E. Hawk
Represented By: Sean Stokes
Represented By: Brian J. Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittany Jurj
Represented By: Christopher E. Hawk
Represented By: Sean Stokes
Represented By: Brian J. Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tilt 3 LLC
Represented By: Sean M. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tilt 1 LLC
Represented By: Sean M. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H3ritage, Inc.
Represented By: Sean M. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tilt 2 LLC
Represented By: Sean M. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Rojer
Represented By: Jon M. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?