Trustees of the Oregon-Washington Carpenters-Employers Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Greyrock Drilling & Piledriving LLC
Plaintiff: Pacific Northwest Regional Council of Carpenters, Trustees of the Oregon-Washington Carpenters-Employers Vacation-Savings Trust Fund, Trustees of the Oregon-Washington Carpenters-Employers Pension Trust Fund, Trustees of the Oregon-Washington Carpenters-Employers Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Oregon-Washington Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund and Trustees of Carpenters International Training Fund
Defendant: GREYROCK DRILLING & PILEDRIVING LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv02023
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Complaint in this matter was filed on 12/12/2019. Plaintiff submitted an Affidavit of Service #4 on 12/17/2019. Defendants answer was due 1/3/2020; however, Defendant has failed to file a responsive pleading or otherwise appear in this case. Thus, pursuant to Local Rule 41-2, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff appear in writing within 14 days from the date of this order to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. If response is not received by 2/14/2020, this matter will be dismissed without further notice. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed as to Greyrock Drilling & Piledriving LLC served on 12/13/2019, answer due on 1/3/2020. (Cadonau, Cary)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Greyrock Drilling & Piledriving LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/13/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/11/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 5/11/2020. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (joha)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6119298 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Pacific Northwest Regional Council of Carpenters, Trustees of the Oregon-Washington Carpenters-Employers Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Oregon-Washington Carpenters-Employers Pension Trust Fund, Trustees of the Oregon-Washington Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Trustees of Carpenters International Training Fund, Trustees of the Oregon-Washington Carpenters-Employers Vacation-Savings Trust Fund against GREYROCK DRILLING & PILEDRIVING LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Cadonau, Cary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Oregon-Washington Carpenters-Employers Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Greyrock Drilling & Piledriving LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Northwest Regional Council of Carpenters
Represented By: Cary R. Cadonau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Oregon-Washington Carpenters-Employers Vacation-Savings Trust Fund
Represented By: Cary R. Cadonau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Oregon-Washington Carpenters-Employers Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Cary R. Cadonau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Oregon-Washington Carpenters-Employers Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Cary R. Cadonau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Oregon-Washington Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Cary R. Cadonau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of Carpenters International Training Fund
Represented By: Cary R. Cadonau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREYROCK DRILLING & PILEDRIVING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?