Van Sant v. Nu-Way Printing & Envelope Co. et al
Plaintiff: Jules Van Sant
Defendant: Morel, Inc. and Nu-Way Printing & Envelope Co.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02058
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1451
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - Defendant Morel, Inc.'s Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ECF #10 ) is GRANTED. Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 2/28/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - Defendant Nu-Way Printing & Envelope Co's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ECF #9 ) is GRANTED. Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 2/28/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
January 14, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Morel, Inc.. (Bricken, Kathleen)
January 14, 2020 Filing 10 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Morel, Inc.. (Bricken, Kathleen)
January 14, 2020 Filing 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Filed by Nu-Way Printing & Envelope Co.. (O'Connor, Karen)
January 3, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed as to Morel, Inc. served on 12/27/2019, answer due on 1/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Service) (Resendiz Gutierrez, Ivan)
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to Nu-Way Printing & Envelope Co. served on 12/27/2019, answer due on 1/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Mailing) (Resendiz Gutierrez, Ivan)
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Service Unexecuted as to Nu-Way Printing & Envelope Co.. (Resendiz Gutierrez, Ivan)
December 26, 2019 Filing 5 Amended Summons Issued Electronically as to Nu-Way Printing & Envelope Co.NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb)
December 24, 2019 Filing 4 Amended Proposed Summons to Defendant Nu-Way Printing & Envelope Co. Filed by Jules Van Sant. (Resendiz Gutierrez, Ivan)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Morel, Inc., Nu-Way Printing & Envelope Co.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jtj)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/17/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/18/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 5/18/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (jtj)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6127221 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Jules Van Sant against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons). (Resendiz Gutierrez, Ivan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Sant v. Nu-Way Printing & Envelope Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morel, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen Carroll Bricken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nu-Way Printing & Envelope Co.
Represented By: Karen L. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jules Van Sant
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Chicoine
Represented By: Ivan Resendiz Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?