Bridges v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Cherylee Bridges
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv00013
Filed: January 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Filing 14 Affidavit of Service upon United States of America served on 2/3/2020 William Barr, Attorney General for the United States Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Chung, Hong)
February 4, 2020 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed as to All Defendants. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney. (Teitelman, Andrew)
January 24, 2020 Filing 12 Third Amended Summons Issued Electronically as to United States of America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jn)
January 14, 2020 Filing 11 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Hong Suk "Paul" Chung (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: pchung. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Hong Suk (Paul) Chung for Cherylee Bridges. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6154065 issued. Signed on 1/14/2020 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (ecp) Modified on 1/15/2020 to correct file date (ecp).
January 14, 2020 Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Hong Suk "Paul" Chung . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6154065. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Teitelman, Andrew)
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 Third Amended Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Teitelman, Andrew)
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 Second Amended Summons Issued Electronically as to United States of America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 Second Amended Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Teitelman, Andrew)
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 First Amended Summons Issued Electronically as to United States of America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 First Amended Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Teitelman, Andrew)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 5/5/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/4/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 6/4/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (joha)
January 6, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Teitelman, Andrew)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6141724 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Cherylee Bridges against All Plaintiffs. (Teitelman, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bridges v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherylee Bridges
Represented By: Andrew E. Teitelman
Represented By: Hong Suk (Paul) Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?