Trine v. Guardian Home Care, Inc.
Plaintiff: Amy Trine
Defendant: Guardian Home Care, Inc., a foreign business corporation, abn Amada Senior Care and Guardian Home Care, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00059
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Karin J Immergut
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Filing 7 Joint Status Report and Proposed Case Management Schedule. Filed by All Defendants. (Copple, Anthony)
February 20, 2020 Filing 6 Answer to #5 Answer to Complaint-Notice of Removal, Counterclaim . Filed by Amy Trine. (Brown, Stephanie)
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) , Counterclaim Amy Trine. Filed by Guardian Home Care, Inc.. (Oborne, Scott)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 5/14/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/15/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 6/15/2020. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (sss)
January 14, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Guardian Home Care, Inc., a foreign business corporation, abn Amada Senior Care. (Copple, Anthony)
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by Guardian Home Care, Inc., a foreign business corporation, abn Amada Senior Care. (Copple, Anthony)
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 19cv48434 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6150734 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Guardian Home Care, Inc., a foreign business corporation, abn Amada Senior Care (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1). (Copple, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trine v. Guardian Home Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Trine
Represented By: Stephanie J. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Home Care, Inc., a foreign business corporation, abn Amada Senior Care
Represented By: Anthony Copple
Represented By: Scott Oberg Oborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Home Care, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Copple
Represented By: Scott William Oborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?