Hill et al v. Umpqua Bank
Plaintiff: Johnniesha M Hill, Terry L Hill and Terry L Hill, Jr
Defendant: Umpqua Bank
Case Number: 3:2020cv00092
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued Electronically as to Umpqua Bank. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
February 24, 2020 Filing 8 Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hill, Terry)
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Change of Address. Filed by Johnniesha M Hill. (joha)
February 10, 2020 Filing 6 Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Order #4 sent to Johnniesha M Hill returned as undeliverable. (joha)
January 24, 2020 Filing 5 Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Discovery order #2 sent to Terry L Hill and Johnniesha M Hill returned as undeliverable. (jn)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Plaintiff's Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party (ECF #3 ) is GRANTED. Signed on 1/23/2020 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (Mailed to Pro Se parties on 1/23/2020.) (mja)
January 17, 2020 Filing 3 Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party. Filed by Terry L Hill. (ecp)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 5/15/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/15/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 6/15/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (Mailed to Pro Se parties on 1/16/2020.) (joha)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Receipt No. 87235. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Terry L Hill, Johnniesha M Hill against Umpqua Bank (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill et al v. Umpqua Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnniesha M Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry L Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry L Hill, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Umpqua Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?