Karthauser v. Columbia 9-1-1 Communications District
Plaintiff: Diana Karthauser
Defendant: Columbia 9-1-1 Communications District
Case Number: 3:2020cv00127
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Filing 5 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand . Filed by Columbia 9-1-1 Communications District. (O'Kasey, Karen)
February 11, 2020 Filing 4 Affidavit of Service upon Columbia 9-1-1 Communications District served on 1/29/2020 Filed by Diana Karthauser. (Ellis, Matthew)
January 23, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Columbia 9-1-1 Communications District. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jn)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 5/22/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/22/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 6/22/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (jn)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6179374 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Diana Karthauser against Columbia 9-1-1 Communications District (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Ellis, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karthauser v. Columbia 9-1-1 Communications District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia 9-1-1 Communications District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Karthauser
Represented By: Stephen L. Brischetto
Represented By: Matthew C. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?