The United States Olympic Committee v. Ungerleider
Plaintiff: The United States Olympic Committee
Defendant: Steven Ungerleider
Case Number: 3:2020cv00135
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Karin J Immergut
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 Case electronically transferred out to the Northern District of California. Other Court Case Number 3:20-cv-01588 assigned. (eo)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: At the request of the parties and pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a), this Court transfers this case to the Northern District of California, San Francisco Division. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (bp)
February 28, 2020 Filing 13 Stipulated Motion for Order to Transfer Venue to Northern District of California. Filed by All Defendants. (Davis, Kenneth)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #5 . Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
February 18, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Wendell L. Taylor. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6188962 #5 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #5 .) (ecp)
February 10, 2020 Filing 11 Affidavit of Service upon Steven Ungerleider served on 2/9/2020 Filed by The United States Olympic Committee. (Sortun, Anna)
January 27, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by The United States Olympic Committee. (Sortun, Anna)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #3 . Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #4 . Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
January 27, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Susan A. Smith. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6188948 #3 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #3 .) (ecp)
January 27, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jean Fundakowski. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6188958 #4 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #4 .) (ecp)
January 24, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Steven Ungerleider. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 5/26/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/22/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 6/22/2020. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (rs)
January 24, 2020 Filing 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Wendell L. Taylor. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6188962. Filed by The United States Olympic Committee. (Sortun, Anna)
January 24, 2020 Filing 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jean Fundakowski. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6188958. Filed by The United States Olympic Committee. (Sortun, Anna)
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Susan A. Smith. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6188948. Filed by The United States Olympic Committee. (Sortun, Anna)
January 23, 2020 Filing 2 Supplement . Filed by The United States Olympic Committee. (Related document(s): Complaint,, #1 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Sortun, Anna)
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6182338 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Included patents/trademarks: 0968566--9/18/1973--United States Olympic Committee, 2311493--1/25/2000--United States Olympic Committee, 2869082--8/3/2004--United States Olympic Committee, 2393845--10/10/2000--United States Olympic Committee, 2301163--12/21/1999--United States Olympic Committee. Filed by The United States Olympic Committee against Steven Ungerleider (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Sortun, Anna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The United States Olympic Committee v. Ungerleider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The United States Olympic Committee
Represented By: Anna Sortun
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Ungerleider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?