USA v. 1971 Chevrolet Chevelle et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 1971 Chevrolet Chevelle, 2012 Cadillac CTS, 2006 Dodge Commercial Sprinter Van, 2004 Harley Davidson XL 1200C and 1993 Harley Davidson FXRP-W
Claimant: Samuel Stocks-Ladd
Case Number: 3:2020cv00199
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for Stay of Civil Forfeiture. Filed by Samuel Stocks-Ladd. (Howes, Celia)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 Claim . Filed by Samuel Stocks-Ladd. Answer is due by 4/3/2020. (Howes, Celia)
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 Process Receipt and Return of Automobiles and Motorcycles (USM 285) Pursuant to the Warrant for Arrest and Seizure of Property, three vehicles and two motorcycles have been seized in accordance with the law. Filed by United States of America. (Lien, Alexis)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 Warrant for Arrest and Seizure of Property Issued. Signed by Judge Anna J. Brown. (slm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Anna J. Brown. (slm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Complaint, in rem, for forfeiture. (fee exempt status selected (AUSA)) Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by USA against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Matthew Fromme, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Lien, Alexis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. 1971 Chevrolet Chevelle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1971 Chevrolet Chevelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2012 Cadillac CTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2006 Dodge Commercial Sprinter Van
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2004 Harley Davidson XL 1200C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1993 Harley Davidson FXRP-W
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Alexis Lien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Samuel Stocks-Ladd
Represented By: Celia A. Howes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?