Yarbrough v. Stryker Corporation et. al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Yarbrough
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corp., Stryker Corporation, Stryker Orthopaedics, Stryker Sales Corporation and Stryker Howmedica, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00506
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Karin J Immergut
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance of Nancy M. Erfle appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Erfle, Nancy)
March 30, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued Electronically as to Stryker Corporation. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
March 30, 2020 Filing 8 Amended Proposed Summons Filed by Cynthia Yarbrough. (Scanlon, Thomas)
March 30, 2020 Filing 7 Corrected Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint, #1 Please reject prior filing onn March 30, 2020.. Filed by Cynthia Yarbrough. (Scanlon, Thomas)
March 30, 2020 Filing 6 Corrected Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint, #1 . Filed by Cynthia Yarbrough. (Scanlon, Thomas)
March 27, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Stryker Howmedica, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Stryker Sales Corporation. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 7/27/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/24/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 8/24/2020. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (rs)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. JURY TRIAL DEMANDED Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6455071 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Cynthia Yarbrough against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons). (Scanlon, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yarbrough v. Stryker Corporation et. al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corp.
Represented By: Nancy M. Erfle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Corporation
Represented By: Nancy M. Erfle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Orthopaedics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Sales Corporation
Represented By: Nancy M. Erfle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Howmedica, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy M. Erfle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Yarbrough
Represented By: Thomas E. Scanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?