Trustees of the Oregon and Southwest Washington Painters Pension Trust Fund et al v. D&B Interiors, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Oregon and Southwest Washington Painters Trust Fund, Gypsum Drywall Labor Management Cooperation Initiative, Trustees of the Oregon and Southwest Washington Drywall Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No. 5, Trustees Of The Employee Painters' Trust, Trustees of the Wall and Ceiling Industry Promotion Fund of Oregon and Southwest Washington and Trustees of the Oregon and Southwest Washington Painters Pension Trust Fund
Defendant: D&B Interiors, LLC, Daren Phillip Wiese and DBI Construction
Case Number: 3:2020cv00538
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2020 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed as to Daren Phillip Wiese served on 4/16/2020, answer due on 5/7/2020. (Ring, Nathan)
May 12, 2020 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed as to D&B Interiors, LLC served on 4/16/2020, answer due on 5/7/2020. (Ring, Nathan)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to D&B Interiors, LLC, Daren Phillip Wiese. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jtj)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 7/31/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/31/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 8/31/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (jtj)
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6480891 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No. 5, Trustees of the Oregon and Southwest Washington Painters Trust Fund, Trustees of the Wall and Ceiling Industry Promotion Fund of Oregon and Southwest Washington, Trustees of the Oregon and Southwest Washington Drywall Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Trustees Of The Employee Painters' Trust, Gypsum Drywall Labor Management Cooperation Initiative against D&B Interiors, LLC, Daren Phillip Wiese (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons DBI, #3 Proposed Summons DBI - Registered Agentg, #4 Proposed Summons Wiese). (Ring, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Oregon and Southwest Washington Painters Pension Trust Fund et al v. D&B Interiors, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Oregon and Southwest Washington Painters Trust Fund
Represented By: Michael A. Urban
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gypsum Drywall Labor Management Cooperation Initiative
Represented By: Michael A. Urban
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Oregon and Southwest Washington Drywall Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Michael A. Urban
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No. 5
Represented By: Michael A. Urban
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees Of The Employee Painters' Trust
Represented By: Michael A. Urban
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Wall and Ceiling Industry Promotion Fund of Oregon and Southwest Washington
Represented By: Michael A. Urban
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Oregon and Southwest Washington Painters Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Michael A. Urban
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D&B Interiors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daren Phillip Wiese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DBI Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?