Jordan et al v. SHLP Cascade Summit, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Isabel Jordan, Chad Hawthorne and Michelle Jordan
Defendant: SHLP Cascade Summit, LLC, fka SRP I-Cascade Summit, LLC, Simpson Realty Group LP, Simpson Realty Group, LP and SHLP Cascade Summit, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00563
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Rent, Lease, Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 10 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (eo) NOTE: This event was deleted and redocketed by the Clerk's Office using the correct event.
May 6, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTES of Proceedings: Rule 16 Conference held before Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman by telephone on 5/6/2020. ORDER SETTING the following case management schedule: Parties are to amend pleadings or add any additional parties or claims by 7/17/2020. Discovery is to be completed by 9/2/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/2/2020. Expert disclosures due by 10/15/2020. Dispositive Motions are due by 11/4/2020. ORDER striking Pretrial Order deadline. The parties may file written consents to proceed before a Magistrate Judge at any time, but the court recommends that consent forms be filed before a dispositive motion (i.e., motion to dismiss, motion for summary judgment) is heard. The consent form may be found in the court's Civil Case Assignment Order (ECF No. #3 , p. 6). For more information regarding the role of magistrate judges and consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction, see ord.uscourts.gov/consent. The parties are advised that a telephone conference must be scheduled with Judge Beckerman before any discovery motion is filed. Adam S. Heder present as counsel for plaintiffs. Joseph C. Arellano and Kathleen Carroll Bricken present as counsel for SHLP Cascade Summit, LLC. Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman presiding. (gw)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Setting a Rule 16 Conference for Wednesday, May 6, 2020, at 10:30 AM by telephone. The parties shall call into the court's conference line (phone number to be provided via separate sealed entry) five minutes before the scheduled conference time. The court will join the conference call at the appointed time. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer before the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If the parties plan to present a proposed schedule, they should e-mail the schedule to giselle_williams@ord.uscourts.gov, by noon the day before the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
April 28, 2020 Filing 7 Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement regarding discovery. Filed by SHLP Cascade Summit, LLC. (Arellano, Joseph)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand - Jury Trial Requested. Filed by SHLP Cascade Summit, LLC. (Arellano, Joseph)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Granting Defendant SHLP Cascade Summit, LLC's Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #4 ). Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 4/27/2020. Ordered on 4/10/2020 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
April 10, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by SHLP Cascade Summit, LLC. (Bricken, Kathleen)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 8/5/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/4/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 9/4/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (joha)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by SHLP Cascade Summit, LLC, fka SRP I-Cascade Summit, LLC. (Bricken, Kathleen)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 20CV05952 from Clackamas. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6500670 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by SHLP Cascade Summit, LLC, fka SRP I-Cascade Summit, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Bricken, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan et al v. SHLP Cascade Summit, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabel Jordan
Represented By: Adam S. Heder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Hawthorne
Represented By: Adam S. Heder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Jordan
Represented By: Adam S. Heder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHLP Cascade Summit, LLC, fka SRP I-Cascade Summit, LLC
Represented By: Kathleen Carroll Bricken
Represented By: Joseph C. Arellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simpson Realty Group LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simpson Realty Group, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHLP Cascade Summit, LLC
Represented By: Kathleen Carroll Bricken
Represented By: Joseph C. Arellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?