Gauthier et al v. Crown Voltage, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Timothy J Gauthier, Oregon and Southwest Washington NECA-IBEW Electrical Workers Audit Committee, Garth Bachman and Timothy J. Gauthier
Defendant: Stacy LaCombe, Daniel Tucker and Crown Voltage, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00578
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Plaintiffs have filed a Motion for Dismissal #9 . Because no answer has been filed, this court treats the motion as a notice of voluntary dismissal without prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i), and directs the Clerk of the Court to close this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
May 15, 2020 Filing 10 Proposed Form of Order Submitted . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda)
May 15, 2020 Filing 9 Motion to Dismiss . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda)
April 30, 2020 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #3 upon Daniel Tucker served on 4/13/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #3 upon Stacy LaCombe served on 4/13/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda)
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #3 upon Crown Voltage, Inc. served on 4/14/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda)
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Crown Voltage, Inc., Stacy LaCombe, Daniel Tucker. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jtj)
April 17, 2020 Filing 4 Amended Complaint Summons issued as to all Defendants. Filed by Timothy J. Gauthier, Garth Bachman, Oregon and Southwest Washington NECA-IBEW Electrical Workers Audit Committee against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Amended, #2 Proposed Summons Amended, #3 Proposed Summons Amended). (Larkin, Linda)
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Crown Voltage, Inc., Daniel Tucker, Stacy LaCombe. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jtj)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 8/7/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/8/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (jtj)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. ERISA Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: BORDC-6513888 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Timothy J Gauthier, Garth Bachman, Oregon and Southwest Washington NECA-IBEW Electrical Workers Audit Committee against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons). (Larkin, Linda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gauthier et al v. Crown Voltage, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy J Gauthier
Represented By: Linda J. Larkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oregon and Southwest Washington NECA-IBEW Electrical Workers Audit Committee
Represented By: Linda J. Larkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garth Bachman
Represented By: Linda J. Larkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy J. Gauthier
Represented By: Linda J. Larkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy LaCombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Voltage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?