Cramer v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Cari L Cramer
Defendant: R&D Williams Log Hauling, Debra Jean Williams and Charles Ronald Williams
Case Number: 3:2020cv00586
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Scheduling Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. Telephonic Rule 16 Conference is SET for 6/22/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Anna J. Brown. Before the Conference, at a minimum counsel must conduct real-time conferral by telephone to prepare a proposed case-management schedule to be submitted to the Court prior to the Rule 16 Conference. The parties shall submit a written joint status report (to include proposed case management schedule) no later than 6/17/2020 that include deadlines to complete discovery, to file dispositive motions, and for trial. Parties shall also determine whether they agree to forgo the disclosures required under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1), and file separately with the Clerk of Court the form required by LR 26-2 no later than 6/17/2020. (bb)
May 21, 2020 Filing 9 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand . Filed by Debra Jean Williams, Charles Ronald Williams. (Buxman, Katie)
May 15, 2020 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service upon Charles Ronald Williams served on 4/28/2020 Filed by Cari L Cramer. (Heiling, Dean)
May 15, 2020 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service upon Debra Jean Williams served on 4/28/2020 Filed by Cari L Cramer. (Heiling, Dean)
April 24, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance of Heather M. Murray appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Murray, Heather)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 Notice Notice of Appearance Filed by All Defendants. (Buxman, Katie)
April 10, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Charles Ronald Williams. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
April 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Debra Jean Williams. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 8/10/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/8/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 9/8/2020. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (rs)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6520105 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Cari L Cramer against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons). (Heiling, Dean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cramer v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&D Williams Log Hauling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Jean Williams
Represented By: Heather M. Murray
Represented By: Katie Buxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Ronald Williams
Represented By: Heather M. Murray
Represented By: Katie Buxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cari L Cramer
Represented By: Dean Heiling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?