Oregon and Southwest Washington NECA-IBEW Electrical Workers Audit Committee et al v. Vitro Electric LLC et al
Plaintiff: Garth Bachman, Timothy J. Gauthier and Oregon and Southwest Washington NECA-IBEW Electrical Workers Audit Committee
Defendant: John Vitro and Vitro Electric LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00589
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Referring Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Filing 11 Declaration of Linda J. Larkin . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for default #10 .) (Larkin, Linda)
June 4, 2020 Filing 10 Motion for Entry of Default . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda)
May 21, 2020 Filing 9 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #7 upon Vitro Electric LLC served on 5/5/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda)
May 20, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Marco A. Hernandez to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (eo)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Vitro Electric LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss)
April 29, 2020 Filing 6 Amended Complaint . Filed by Oregon and Southwest Washington NECA-IBEW Electrical Workers Audit Committee, Timothy J. Gauthier, Garth Bachman against Vitro Electric LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Amended). (Larkin, Linda)
April 23, 2020 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #3 upon John Vitro served on 4/16/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #3 upon Vitro Electric LLC served on 4/16/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Larkin, Linda)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to John Vitro, Vitro Electric LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 8/11/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/10/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 9/10/2020. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (sss)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. ERISA Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6520503 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Oregon and Southwest Washington NECA-IBEW Electrical Workers Audit Committee, Timothy J. Gauthier, Garth Bachman against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons). (Larkin, Linda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oregon and Southwest Washington NECA-IBEW Electrical Workers Audit Committee et al v. Vitro Electric LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garth Bachman
Represented By: Linda J. Larkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy J. Gauthier
Represented By: Linda J. Larkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oregon and Southwest Washington NECA-IBEW Electrical Workers Audit Committee
Represented By: Linda J. Larkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Vitro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vitro Electric LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?