Villeda v. Garrett
Defendant: Sheriff Pat Garrett
Petitioner: Julio Villeda
Case Number: 3:2020cv00901
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Karin J Immergut
Referring Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Scheduling Order by Judge Karin J. Immergut. Video hearing set for 8/4/2020 at 10:00AM in Portland by videoconference before Judge Karin J. Immergut. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut.Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00865-IM, 3:20-cv-00889-IM, 3:20-cv-00899-IM, 3:20-cv-00901-IM, 3:20-cv-00912-IM (jy)
July 8, 2020 Filing 15 Brief in Support of Petition Consolidated Reply Brief. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Corrected Appendix, #2 Exhibit B Email Exchange Between Merrithew and Smith)Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00865-IM, 3:20-cv-00889-IM, 3:20-cv-00899-IM, 3:20-cv-00901-IM, 3:20-cv-00912-IM (Gerstein, Charles)
July 2, 2020 Filing 14 Declaration of Elmer M. Dickens . Filed by Pat Garrett, Pat Garret. (Related document(s): Response to Habeas Petition (2241), (17 in 3:20-cv-00865-IM).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00865-IM, 3:20-cv-00889-IM, 3:20-cv-00899-IM, 3:20-cv-00901-IM, 3:20-cv-00912-IM (Dickens, Elmer)
June 30, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Association of Attorney Kimberly Stuart for Pat Garrett. Filed by Pat Garret. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00865-IM, 3:20-cv-00889-IM, 3:20-cv-00899-IM, 3:20-cv-00901-IM, 3:20-cv-00912-IM (Stuart, Kimberly)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting Motion #10 . Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting Motion #9 . Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
June 30, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Filed by Julio Villeda. (Mikkilineni, Tara)
June 29, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Filed by Julio Villeda. (Gerstein, Charles)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Petitioners' Motion for Pro Hac Admission to Consolidated Cases #14 is GRANTED to the extent that the Court waives the special admission fee for Gerstein and Mikkilineni in the cases noted herein. The Court directs Gerstein and Mikkilineni to file separate motions for leave to appear pro hac vice and completed pro hac vice applications in each case in which they intend to appear. The Court notes that the motions and completed applications must be filed as a miscellaneous motion event rather than Leave to Appear Pro Vice to avoid the imposition of the special admission fee. Signed on 6/25/2020 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00865-IM, 3:20-cv-00889-IM, 3:20-cv-00899-IM, 3:20-cv-00901-IM, 3:20-cv-00912-IM (dsg)
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 Motion to Extend PHV Admission to Consolidated Cases. Filed by Aaron Gillihan, Eric Raney, Julio Villeda, Jayson Robert Mee.Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00865-IM, 3:20-cv-00889-IM, 3:20-cv-00899-IM, 3:20-cv-00901-IM, 3:20-cv-00912-IM (Mikkilineni, Tara)
June 16, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephone Status Conference held on 6/16/2020 with Judge Karin J. Immergut presiding. Oral argument heard with regard to Petitioner's Motion to Expedite or Accelerate Hearing on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #2 and Petitioners' Motion to Consolidate 6 . The parties agree that Petitioners Vernon Rasmussen (3:20-cv-00865-IM), Eric Raney (3:20-cv-00889-IM), Jayson Mee (3:20-cv-00899-IM), Julio Villeda (3:20-cv-00901-IM), and Aaron Gillihan (3:20-cv-00912-IM) present common questions of law to warrant consolidation. ORDER - GRANTING Petitioner's Motion to Consolidate 6 , and GRANTING expedited hearing to the extent that the Court sets an accelerated briefing schedule as follows: Respondent must file a responsive brief as to all petitions cited herein by 12:00 p.m. on 7/3/2020. Petitioners shall file a reply by 7/8/2020. A hearing, if necessary, will be scheduled promptly thereafter. Tara Mikkilineni, Charles Gerstein, and Jesse Merrithew present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Elmer Manuel Dickens, Jr. present as counsel for defendant(s).(Court Reporter Jill Jessup.)Judge Karin J. Immergut presiding. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00865-IM, 3:20-cv-00889-IM, 3:20-cv-00899-IM, 3:20-cv-00901-IM, 3:20-cv-00912-IM(jy)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Scheduling Order by Judge Karin J. Immergut. Status Conference is set for 6/16/2020 at 2:00PM in Portland by telephone before Judge Karin J. Immergut. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai to Judge Karin J. Immergut. (eo)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (sb)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Service by Julio Villeda of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2241, #1 Filed by Julio Villeda. (Merrithew, Jesse)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241- Federal) Filing Fee in amount of $5 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6793313. Filed by Julio Villeda against Pat Garrett (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Supplement Memorandum in Support, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Merrithew, Jesse)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villeda v. Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Pat Garrett
Represented By: Kimberly Stuart
Represented By: Elmer Manuel Dickens, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Julio Villeda
Represented By: Viktoria Safarian
Represented By: Jesse A. Merrithew
Represented By: Charles Gerstein
Represented By: Tara Mikkilineni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?