Trustees Of The Employee Painters' Trust v. Silverton Glass, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Trustees Of The Employee Painters' Trust
Defendant: Wendell Lynn James d/b/a Silverton Glass SG1, Silverton Glass, LLC and Wayne Kaiebu Newson
Case Number: 3:2020cv00902
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1002
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Dismissal of Party (Wendell Lynn James d/b/a Silverton Glass SG1) Filed by Trustees Of The Employee Painters' Trust. (Ring, Nathan)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Wendell Lynn James, Wayne Kaiebu Newson, Silverton Glass, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 10/5/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/2/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (joha)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6793416 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Trustees Of The Employee Painters' Trust against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Ring, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees Of The Employee Painters' Trust v. Silverton Glass, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendell Lynn James d/b/a Silverton Glass SG1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silverton Glass, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Kaiebu Newson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees Of The Employee Painters' Trust
Represented By: Michael A. Urban
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?