Blackford et al v. Cura CS LLC
Plaintiff: Brian Blackford and William Stahr
Defendant: Cura CS LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00982
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Brian Blackford, William Stahr. (Hoesly, Cody)
July 2, 2020 Filing 12 Clerk's Notice of Pay.gov Refund regarding Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6859290 & AORDC-6859374. The request has been granted and the amount of $800.00, 2@$400.00 each, will be refunded to C. Robert Steringer Related Doc #5 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. (nd)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The parties' Unopposed Motion for Continuing Deadlines #9 is GRANTED as follows. The deadline for Defendant to respond or answer Plaintiff's complaint is extended from 06/25/2020 to 30 days after the court decides Plaintiff's forthcoming motion to remand, which is due to be filed by 07/17/2020. The parties are ORDERED to submit a Rule 26(f) proposed scheduling order no later than 14 days after the court resolves the motion to remand. The deadlines entered by the court in #4 are STAYED until the court resolves the motion to remand. The parties should proceed with discovery during the pendency of the motion to remand, as described by the Federal Rules. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #6 , #7 , and #8 . Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by Brian Blackford, William Stahr. (Hoesly, Cody)
June 25, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Frederick J. Klorczyk III. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6896569 #8 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Frederick J. Klorczyk III. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6896569. Filed by Brian Blackford, William Stahr. (Klorczyk, Frederick)
June 25, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Neal J. Deckant. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6889605 #7 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
June 25, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Brittany S. Scott. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6889250 #6 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Neal J. Deckant. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6889605. Filed by Brian Blackford, William Stahr. (Deckant, Neal)
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Brittany S. Scott. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6889250. Filed by Brian Blackford, William Stahr. (Scott, Brittany)
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically regarding Notice of Removal, #2 . Filed by Cura CS LLC. (Sweitzer, Graham)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 10/20/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/19/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 11/19/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (joha)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 Two duplicate payments in the amount of $400.00 each for a total of $800.00 were submitted by Cura CS LLC in the above-referenced case. For information on refund procedures, visit #Requesting a Refund of Electronically Paid Fees on the Court website. Refund Request is Due 6/29/2020. (lp)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Removal Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6859454 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Cura CS LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Sweitzer, Graham)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 Declaration of Graham M. Sweitzer In Support of Notice of Removal. Filed by Cura CS LLC. (Sweitzer, Graham)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackford et al v. Cura CS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Blackford
Represented By: Cody B. Hoesly
Represented By: Neal J. Deckant
Represented By: Frederick John Klorczyk, III
Represented By: Brittany Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Stahr
Represented By: Cody B. Hoesly
Represented By: Neal J. Deckant
Represented By: Brittany Scott
Represented By: Frederick John Klorczyk, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cura CS LLC
Represented By: C. Robert Steringer
Represented By: William F. Gary
Represented By: Graham M. Sweitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?