Roberts v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Richard B Roberts
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2020cv01151
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0405g
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner Social Security Administration. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 . Signed on 7/21/2020 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Social Security Procedural Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (ecp)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP . Filed by Richard B Roberts. (Kerr, Kevin)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint to Review Final Decision of Commissioner (In forma pauperis status selected). Filed by Richard B Roberts against Commissioner Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Kerr, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Renata Gowie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard B Roberts
Represented By: Kevin Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?