Marshall v. R.L.K. and Company
Plaintiff: Clayton Marshall
Defendant: R.L.K. and Company an Oregon corporation doing business as Timberline Lodge doing business as Timberline Ski Area doing business as Timberline Property Management doing business as Summit Chevron doing business as Mt. Hood Brewery Company at Tilikum
Case Number: 3:2020cv01157
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0216
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #5 as follows and as modified: Answer deadline reset to 10/13/2020 for Defendant R.L.K. and Company. (gm)
August 7, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by R.L.K. and Company. (Walsh, Patricia)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #1 . Filed by R.L.K. and Company. (Walsh, Patricia)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to R.L.K. and Company. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jn)
July 18, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons Filed by Clayton Marshall. (Egan, Jon)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 11/16/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/14/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 12/14/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (jn)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7001616 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Clayton Marshall against R.L.K. and Company (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Egan, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall v. R.L.K. and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.L.K. and Company an Oregon corporation doing business as Timberline Lodge doing business as Timberline Ski Area doing business as Timberline Property Management doing business as Summit Chevron doing business as Mt. Hood Brewery Company at Tilikum
Represented By: Brad C. Stanford
Represented By: Patricia A. Walsh
Represented By: Kelly R. Tilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Marshall
Represented By: Jon M. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?