Poulson v. Portland Parks and Recreation Dept. et al
Plaintiff: K. Ty Poulson
Defendant: Portland Parks and Recreation Dept. and Portland Police Bureau
Case Number: 3:2020cv01186
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - For the reasons stated, the Court grants Poulson's application to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #1 ), but dismisses Poulson's complaint for failure to state a claim. Poulson may file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days if he is able to cure the deficiencies discussed herein. Failure to file an amended complaint will result in dismissal of this action. Signed on 7/24/2020 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/24/2020.) (mja)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/21/2020.) (joha)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by K. Ty Poulson against Portland Parks and Recreation Dept., Portland Police Bureau. (joha)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by K. Ty Poulson. (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poulson v. Portland Parks and Recreation Dept. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portland Parks and Recreation Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portland Police Bureau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. Ty Poulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?