Valdez v. Nationwide Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Saul Valdez
Defendant: Nationwide Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv01196
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (rs)
August 27, 2020 Filing 10 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 8/20/2020. Deadline to amend pleadings and join parties is 9/11/2020. Answer is due 10/02/2020. Fact Discovery is to be completed by 4/30/2021. Initial expert disclosures shall be exchanged by 4/30/2021, and rebuttal expert disclosures shall be exchanged by 5/31/2021. Expert Discovery to be completed by 6/30/2021. Dispositive motions, if any, are due by 7/30/2021. Joint Alternative Dispute Resolution report is waived. For information regarding the role of magistrate judges and consenting to magistrate jurisdiction, see https://ord.uscourts.gov/consent. Any discovery matters will be handled on an informal basis. Unless otherwise ordered, in the event a discovery motion is filed, no written response to the motion will be required. Judge You does not require a paper judge's copy pursuant to LR 5-9 for filings that are submitted to her for consideration. Robert E.L. Bonaparte present as counsel for plaintiff. Ronald J. Clark present as counsel for defendant. Court Reporter: None. Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You presiding. (pvh)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Scheduling Order: SETTING a Telephonic Rule 16 Conference for Thursday, 8/20/2020 at 09:00AM before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. Local Rules 16-2 and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #4 is granted. Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 8/28/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 Declaration of Ronald J. Clark . Filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #4 .) (Clark, Ronald)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. (Clark, Ronald)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 11/20/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/21/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (rs)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. (Clark, Ronald)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 20CV24108 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7022978 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Clark, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valdez v. Nationwide Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Richard Williams
Represented By: Ronald J. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saul Valdez
Represented By: Robert E.L. Bonaparte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?