Campbell et al v. Wyndham Resort Development Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Lori Campbell and Arno Campbell
Defendant: Worldmark, The Club NPO, John Does 1-50 and Wyndham Resort Development Corp.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01296
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Referring Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Proceedings Without Prejudice. Signed on 8/24/2020 by Judge Michael H. Simon.(Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/24/2020.) (mja)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Proceeding Without Prejudice by Worldmark, The Club NPO, Wyndham Resort Development Corp.. Filed by Worldmark, The Club NPO, Wyndham Resort Development Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bateman, Meredith)
August 11, 2020 Filing 8 Declaration of Meredith D.M. Bateman . Filed by Worldmark, The Club NPO, Wyndham Resort Development Corp.. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Compel #7 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Bateman, Meredith)
August 11, 2020 Filing 7 Motion to Dismiss and/or Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, Motion to Compel Arbitration. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Wyndham Resort Development Corp., Worldmark, The Club NPO. (Bateman, Meredith)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Worldmark, The Club NPO, Wyndham Resort Development Corp.. (Bateman, Meredith)
August 11, 2020 NOTICE OF NON-ADMITTED COUNSEL Attorney Conner Spani is required to submit a request for Admission to the District of Oregon via PACER. For instructions visit #ord.uscourts.gov/admissions . (Related document(s): Notice of Removal #1 .) (sss)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Defendants' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ECF #3 ) is GRANTED as to David C. Neu. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Anna J. Brown to Judge Michael H. Simon. (Courtesy copy sent to plaintiff's counsel Conner Spani via e-mail on 8/10/20.) (eo)
August 7, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney David C. Neu. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7080296 #3 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (sss)
August 6, 2020 NOTICE OF REGISTRATION REQUIREMENT. David C. Neu is required to submit a request to e-file in the District of Oregon via PACER before this motion may be ruled upon or filing privileges granted. For instructions visit #ord.uscourts.gov/prohac. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #3 .) (ecp)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney David C. Neu. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7080296. Filed by Worldmark, The Club NPO, Wyndham Resort Development Corp.. (Bateman, Meredith)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 12/3/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/4/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 1/4/2021. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. A copy of this order is mailed to attorney Connor Spani on this date. (cw)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 20cv22620 from Clatsop County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7072319 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Wyndham Resort Development Corp., Worldmark, The Club NPO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Bateman, Meredith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell et al v. Wyndham Resort Development Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worldmark, The Club NPO
Represented By: Meredith Bateman
Represented By: David C. Neu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Resort Development Corp.
Represented By: Meredith Bateman
Represented By: David C. Neu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arno Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?