Parker v. St. Jude Operating Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: David Othello Parker
Defendant: St. Jude Operating Company, LLC and Benicia Senior Living, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01325
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 Reply to Motion to Remand to State Court #6 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Janzen, Caroline)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand to State Court #6 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Estok, Michael)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #4 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Estok, Michael)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #4 oral argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Janzen, Caroline)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 Motion to Remand to State Court. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Janzen, Caroline)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 12/11/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/11/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 1/11/2021. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (rs)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Estok, Michael)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by St. Jude Operating Company, LLC. (Beattie, Jay)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Benicia Senior Living, LLC. (Beattie, Jay)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 20CV18539 from Multnomah County Circuit Court.Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7080681. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by St. Jude Operating Company, LLC, Benicia Senior Living, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Beattie, Jay) Modified docket text on 8/6/2020 to add payment information. (eo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. St. Jude Operating Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Othello Parker
Represented By: Paul Robert Armstrong Janzen
Represented By: Caroline Janzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Jude Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: Melissa J. Bushnick
Represented By: Kelly A. Giampa
Represented By: Jay W. Beattie
Represented By: Michael J. Estok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benicia Senior Living, LLC
Represented By: Melissa J. Bushnick
Represented By: Kelly A. Giampa
Represented By: Jay W. Beattie
Represented By: Michael J. Estok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?