Dorsey v. Scharf et al
Plaintiff: James A. Dorsey
Defendant: Marty G. Liesegang and Joseph R. Scharf
Case Number: 3:2020cv01326
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JUDGMENT - Based on the Court's ORDER, IT IS ADJUDGED that this case is DISMISSED. Signed on 10/1/2020 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 10/1/2020.) (mja)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - No party having made objections, this Court follows the recommendation of the Advisory Committee and reviews Judge You's Findings and Recommendation for clear error on the face of the record. No such error is apparent. Accordingly, the Court ADOPTS Judge You's Findings and Recommendation, ECF #9 . Plaintiff's Complaint, ECF #1 , is DISMISSED. Signed on 10/1/2020 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 10/1/2020.) (mja)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: referring Findings & Recommendations #9 to Judge Michael H. Simon for his review and determination. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/01/2020.) (pvh)
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 Findings & Recommendations: Because plaintiff's complaint is frivolous and fails to state a claim for relief, the case should be dismissed without prejudice under the in forma pauperis statute. These Findings and Recommendations will be referred to a district judge. Objections, if any, are due Monday, September 21, 2020. If no objections are filed, then the Findings and Recommendations will go under advisement on that date. If objections are filed, then a response is due within 14 days after being served with a copy of the objections. When the response is due or filed, whichever date is earlier, the Findings and Recommendations will go under advisement. Signed on 9/01/2020 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/01/2020.) (pvh)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 Response to Order to Show Cause. Filed by James A. Dorsey. (eo)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice to Self-Represented Litigants. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/27/2020.) (pvh)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff has filed an application to proceed in forma pauperis #5 . The court previously granted plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis in an Order to Show Cause #4 issued on August 12, 2020. Thus, plaintiff's recently-filed application to proceed in forma pauperis is moot. Plaintiff must still show cause by August 31, 2020, why his case should not be dismissed for the reasons set forth in the August 12, 2020 Order to Show Cause. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/18/2020.) (pvh)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by James A. Dorsey. (eo)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order to Show Cause. Signed on 8/12/2020 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/12/2020.) (pvh)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/7/20.) (eo)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by James A. Dorsey. (eo)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint.. Filed by James A. Dorsey against Marty G. Liesegang, Joseph R. Scharf (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (eo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorsey v. Scharf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty G. Liesegang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R. Scharf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A. Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?