Hurth v. Salazar
Petitioner: Pierre Maurice Hurth
Respondent: Josias Salazar
Case Number: 3:2020cv01354
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John Jelderks
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Mandamus and Other
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Should Petitioner wish to continue with this case, he must submit a filing fee or an application to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed on 8/25/2020 by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/25/2020.) (dsg)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/12/2020.) (joha)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241- Federal). (NO IFP Filed, NO Filing Fee Paid) Filed by Pierre Maurice Hurth against Josias Salazar. (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurth v. Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Josias Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pierre Maurice Hurth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?