Manker v. Evans
Plaintiff: Bradley Manker doing business as 35 Corks Art Studio
Defendant: Jeanell Evans
Case Number: 3:2020cv01367
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Defendants Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #7 is GRANTED. Defendants response to Plaintiffs Complaint shall be filed no later than 10/30/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by All Defendants. (Ford, Susan)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance of Susan L Ford appearing on behalf of Jeanell Evans Filed by on behalf of Jeanell Evans. (Ford, Susan)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Jeanell Evans. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jn)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 Copyright Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to 17 U.S.C. section 508(a), which states: Within one month after the filing of any action under this title, the clerks of the courts of the United States shall send written notification to the Register of Copyrights setting forth, as far as is shown by the papers filed in the court, the names and addresses of the parties and the title, author, and registration number of each work involved in the action. (Mailed to the Register of Copyrights). (jn)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/11/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/11/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 1/11/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (jn)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 First Proposed Summons Filed by Bradley Manker. (Neuman, Jeffrey)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 First Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7103965 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included copyrights: VA-0002199226--American Sign Language (ASL Sight Words Compendium--Bradley Manker. Filed by Bradley Manker against Jeanell Evans (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit). (Neuman, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manker v. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanell Evans
Represented By: Susan L Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Manker doing business as 35 Corks Art Studio
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Neuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?