Cano v. Circuit Court Of The State Of Oregon For The County of Multnomah
Petitioner: Ramon Reyes Cano and Martin Moreno Ruiz
Respondent: Circuit Court Of The State Of Oregon For The County of Multnomah
Case Number: 3:2020cv01413
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 JUDGMENT: This action is DISMISSED. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 10/14/2020.) (dsg)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Review of petitioner's application reveals that he is unable to pay the filing fee for this action, and his IFP application is allowed. However, federal review of the Petition is barred by the lack of jurisdiction and the statute of limitations, and this action is DISMISSED. Signed on 10/13/2020 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 10/14/2020.) (dsg)
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Ramon Reyes Cano regarding Case Assignment Notice #3 . (joha)
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Notice of Case Assignment #3 sent to Ramon Reyes Cano returned as undeliverable. (joha)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/18/2020.) (joha)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). Filed by Ramon Reyes Cano against Circuit Court Of The State Of Oregon For The County of Multnomah. (joha)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Ramon Reyes Cano. (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cano v. Circuit Court Of The State Of Oregon For The County of Multnomah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ramon Reyes Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Martin Moreno Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Circuit Court Of The State Of Oregon For The County of Multnomah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?