Bertolino v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Michelle M. Bertolino
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service, Angelique M Herndon, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Oregon Department of Revenue and Steven C. Williams
Case Number: 3:2020cv01431
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. Granting Unopposed Motion #3 for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by the United States. The United States response to Plaintiffs Complaint is now due 10/23/20. (bb)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Internal Revenue Service. (Bourget, Boris)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 12/21/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/19/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 1/19/2021. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 20CV25854 from Clackamas County Circuit Court. (fee exempt status selected (AUSA)). Filed by Internal Revenue Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Summonses and Proofs of Service), #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Bourget, Boris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bertolino v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Boris Bourget
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelique M Herndon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle M. Bertolino
Represented By: Michelle M. Bertolino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?