WaterWatch of Oregon v. U.S. Bureau of Reclamation
Plaintiff: WaterWatch of Oregon
Defendant: U.S. Bureau of Reclamation
Case Number: 3:2020cv01445
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Filed by U.S. Bureau of Reclamation. (Keller, Joshua)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #4 . Answer is due by 10/27/2020. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #1 . Filed by U.S. Bureau of Reclamation. (Keller, Joshua)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to U.S. Bureau of Reclamation. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/28/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/25/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 1/25/2021. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (rs)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7151014 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by WaterWatch of Oregon against U.S. Bureau of Reclamation (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Rule, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WaterWatch of Oregon v. U.S. Bureau of Reclamation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WaterWatch of Oregon
Represented By: Lauren M. Rule
Represented By: Elizabeth Hunter Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bureau of Reclamation
Represented By: Joshua Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?