Glover v. Avanos Medical, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Berenice Carol Glover
Defendant: Dr. Jacob Anderson, MD, Dr. James Heilman, MD, Dr. John Moorhead, MD, Avanos Medical, Inc doing business as Halyard Health, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, Dr. Phil Van, MD, Dr. Thomas Knowles, MD, Dr. Mohamud Daya, MD, Dr. Shana Kusin, MD, Oregon Health and Science University, Dr. Martin Schreiber, MD, Dr. Robert Martindale, MD, Dr. Inna Shniter, MD, Dr. Shannon Appy, MD and Dr. Valerie Griffeth, MD
Case Number: 3:2020cv01452
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Referring Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATED LIMITED JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT OREGON HEALTH AND SCIENCE UNIVERSITY:. Signed on 9/15/2020 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta.(Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/15/2020.) (pjg)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 Stipulation Limited Judgment of Dismissal as to Defendant Oregon Health and Science University by Oregon Health and Science University. Filed by Oregon Health and Science University. (Jones, Nikola)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta: Telephone Rule 16 Conference is SET for Tuesday, November 3, 2020 at 10:30 AM in Portland before Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. The Court's conference call information shall be provided by separate entry. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/10/2020.) (pjg) .
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 Clerk's Notice of Pay.gov Refund regarding Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7153285. The request has been granted and the amount of $400.00 will be refunded to Ashley Michael Related Doc #7 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. (nd)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically regarding Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by Avanos Medical, Inc. (Pelkey, Emma)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Avanos Medical, Inc. (Pelkey, Emma)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 Defendant Avanos Medical, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand . Filed by Avanos Medical, Inc. (Pelkey, Emma)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Anna J. Brown to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/27/20.) (eo)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 A duplicate payment in the amount of $400.00 was submitted by Avanos Medical, Inc in the above-referenced case. For information on refund procedures, visit #Requesting a Refund of Electronically Paid Fees on the Court website. Refund Request is Due 9/8/2020. (lp)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 12/23/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/22/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 1/22/2021. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (sb)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 19CV0560 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7153367 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Avanos Medical, Inc., dba Halyard Health, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet). (Pelkey, Emma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glover v. Avanos Medical, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jacob Anderson, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. James Heilman, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. John Moorhead, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avanos Medical, Inc doing business as Halyard Health, Inc., a Delaware Corporation
Represented By: Emma P. Pelkey
Represented By: Eric J. Neiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Phil Van, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Thomas Knowles, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Mohamud Daya, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Shana Kusin, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Health and Science University
Represented By: Nikola L. Jones
Represented By: Kaiti S. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Martin Schreiber, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Robert Martindale, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Inna Shniter, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Shannon Appy, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Valerie Griffeth, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berenice Carol Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?