(BK) Svenhard's Swedish Bakery v. United States Bakery, et al
Plaintiff: Allied Packing Corp., Northern California General Teamsters Security Fund, Mountain States Bakeries LLC, Michael Petitt, Kenneth Hall, Murrey R. Albers, Svenhard's Swedish Bakery, United States Bakery and Central California Baking Company
Trustee: Tracy Hope Davis and Office of the U.S. Trustee (Sac)
Case Number: 3:2020cv01454
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal 28 USC 157
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael H. Simon. (eo)
August 25, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO NON-ADMITTED COUNSEL: This case has been transferred to the U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon from the Eastern District of California. Our records indicate that you are not admitted to practice in the District of Oregon. Admissions information is governed by #LR 83, and information about the admissions process is available on the #admissions page of the Court website. Related Document Case Transferred In - District Transfer #11 . (eo)
August 25, 2020 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-01205. Electronic file received.
August 25, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: 10 Minutes served on Allied Packing Corp. (Michel, G.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/25/2020.]
August 25, 2020 CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/25/2020.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTES for proceedings held via video conference before District Judge John A. Mendez: D. Talerico and S. Cera appeared via video for Plaintiff. H. Bedoyan, S. Wilker and T. Conway appeared via video for Defendants. The Court and Counsel discussed Defendants' Motion to Withdraw Reference and Motion to Change Venue. After arguments, for the reasons stated on the record, the Court GRANTED Defendants' #1 Motion to Withdraw Reference and #3 Motion to Change Venue and TRANSFERRED the case to the District of Oregon for all future proceedings. Court Reporter: D. Shepard. [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Michel, G.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/25/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 REPLY by Defendants to #6 Opposition to Motion. (Bedoyan, Hagop) Modified on 8/19/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/25/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 REPLY by United States Bakery re #7 Opposition to Motion. (Bedoyan, Hagop) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/25/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 7 OPPOSITION by Svenhard's Swedish Bakery to #3 Motion to Change Venue,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ronny Svenhard, #2 Declaration of David C. Kunkel, #3 Exhibits to Kunkel Declaration, #4 Proof of Service)(Talerico, Derrick) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/25/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 OPPOSITION by Svenhard's Swedish Bakery to #1 Motion to Withdraw Reference. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Talerico, Derrick) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/25/2020.]
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Thomas C Bright on behalf of Svenhard's Swedish Bakery. Attorney Bright, Thomas C added. (Bright, Thomas) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/25/2020.]
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Solomon B Cera on behalf of Svenhard's Swedish Bakery. Attorney Cera, Solomon B added. (Cera, Solomon) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/25/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to TRANSFER VENUE by Murrey R. Albers, et al. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Steven M. Wilker, #3 Exhibits 1-6, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibits 8-12)(Bedoyan, Hagop) Modified on 7/29/2020 (Huang, H). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/25/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER: The Motion to Withdraw Reference #1 is SET for hearing on August 25, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 6 before District Judge John A. Mendez; Opposition or a statement of non-opposition should be filed no less than 14 days prior to the hearing, and replies 7 days prior to the hearing as provided by Local Rule 230. (Text Only Entry) (Vine, H) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/25/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to WITHDRAW REFERENCE by Defendants United States Bakery, et al.(Becknal, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/25/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (BK) Svenhard's Swedish Bakery v. United States Bakery, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied Packing Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern California General Teamsters Security Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mountain States Bakeries LLC
Represented By: Timothy J. Conway
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Hagop Tatios Bedoyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Petitt
Represented By: Timothy J. Conway
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Hagop Tatios Bedoyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Hall
Represented By: Timothy J. Conway
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Hagop Tatios Bedoyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murrey R. Albers
Represented By: Timothy J. Conway
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Hagop Tatios Bedoyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Svenhard's Swedish Bakery
Represented By: Solomon B Cera
Represented By: Thomas C Bright
Represented By: Derrick Matthew Talerico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Bakery
Represented By: Timothy J. Conway
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Hagop Tatios Bedoyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central California Baking Company
Represented By: Timothy J. Conway
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Hagop Tatios Bedoyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Tracy Hope Davis
Represented By: Jason M. Blumberg, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee (Sac)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?