Hensley v. Angiletta
Plaintiff: Leanne J. Hensley
Defendant: Michael Angiletta
Case Number: 3:2020cv01539
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by Leanne J. Hensley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J) (eo) NOTE: Exhibit D was submitted by the filer as separate Exhibits A-Z, but has been combined into a single Exhibit for clarity.
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Plaintiff's application #3 for leave to proceed IFP is granted. Plaintiff's Complaint #1 is dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint, curing deficiencies noted in this order, within 30 days of this order. Dated: 10/6/2020. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez.(Mailed to Pro Se party on 10/7/2020.) (cw)
September 5, 2020 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint #1 . Filed by Leanne J. Hensley. (eo)
September 5, 2020 Filing 3 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Leanne J. Hensley. (eo)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/4/20.) (eo)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. No filing fee paid or IFP application presented. Filed by Leanne J. Hensley against Michael Angiletta. (eo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hensley v. Angiletta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leanne J. Hensley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Angiletta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?