Pascual Felix et al v. Director, Texas Service Center, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: C-R-P-P- and Felix Pascual Felix
Defendant: Acting Secretary, DH Chad F. Wolf, Director, Texas Serv Gregory A. Richardson, US Attorney General William Barr, Director, Texas Service Center, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security and Attorney General of the United States
Case Number: 3:2020cv01553
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Referring Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Smith, Philip)
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance of Alison M. Milne appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Milne, Alison)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/15/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/16/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (joha)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, Attorney General of the United States, Director, Texas Service Center, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 . Signed on 9/16/2020 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #2 Application for leave to proceed ifp. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The name of a minor was included in the document. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment redacting the name of the minor.)The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw)
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Anna J. Brown to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (eo)
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Anna J. Brown. (joha)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Smith, Philip) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/15/2020) (cw).
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. (In forma pauperis status selected) Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Felix Pascual Felix against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Work Authorization Denial Decision, #2 Exhibit B - Asylum application filed in Immigration Court, #3 Exhibit C - Initial detention and charging documents, #4 Exhibit D - Immigration Court hearing notice, #5 Exhibit E - Spouse asylum application filed in court, #6 Exhibit F - work authorization receipt notices, #7 Exhibit G - Approval notices for spouse and other children, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Proposed Summons). (Smith, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pascual Felix et al v. Director, Texas Service Center, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary, DH Chad F. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, Texas Serv Gregory A. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney General William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, Texas Service Center, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Alison M. Milne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Alison M. Milne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the United States
Represented By: Alison M. Milne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C-R-P-P-
Represented By: Philip James Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Pascual Felix
Represented By: Philip James Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?