Grange v. Prestige Financial Services Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Todd Grange
Defendant: John & Jane Does 2-10, Prestige Financial Services Inc., Repossession Company Auto Insurance Company, Repossession Company Business Insurance Company, Repossession Agent Company Bond Company, John & Jane Does 11-100, Repossession Agent Tow Truck Driver John Doe 1 Auto Insurance Company, Repossession Agent Company and John Doe 1
Case Number: 3:2020cv01561
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 13 Response to Order to Show Cause . Filed by Todd Grange. (Grange, Todd)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order to Show Cause: Plaintiff's civil filing fee of $400.00 remains due given that check #1284 was returned unpaid on 9/28/20. Therefore, Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The deadline to respond to this order is 10/30/20. Failure to respond to this order will result in this case being dismissed with prejudice. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Prestige Financial Services Inc.. (Killeen, Tyler)
October 13, 2020 Filing 10 Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Answer and Affirmative Defenses. Filed by Prestige Financial Services Inc.. (Killeen, Tyler)
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 Request . Filed by Todd Grange. (Grange, Todd)
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 Notice: Check #1284 in the amount of $400.00 was accepted for payment of the civil filing fee in this case on 9/16/2020, and was returned unpaid on 9/28/20. The filing fee remains due. The Clerk's Office Finance Department will contact the remitter by mail with instructions for payment of the fee and any NSF fees that may apply. (eo)
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 Verified Return of Service Executed as to Prestige Financial Services Inc. served on 9/22/2020, answer due on 10/13/2020. (Grange, Todd)
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Prestige Financial Services Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
September 16, 2020 Filing fee in amount of $400.00 collected; Receipt No. 90187 issued. (ljp)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 First Motion to Compel Ex-Parte. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Supplement memorandum) (Grange, Todd)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiffs Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self- Represented Party #2 is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael W. Mosman. (eo)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party. Filed by Todd Grange. (eo)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Todd Grange against All Defendants. No filing fee or IFP application submitted at filing. Submitted via e-mail per Standing Order 2020-8. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (eo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grange v. Prestige Financial Services Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Grange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John & Jane Does 2-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prestige Financial Services Inc.
Represented By: Kennon H. Scott
Represented By: Tyler J. Killeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Repossession Company Auto Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Repossession Company Business Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Repossession Agent Company Bond Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John & Jane Does 11-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Repossession Agent Tow Truck Driver John Doe 1 Auto Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Repossession Agent Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?